Вы находитесь на странице: 1из 12
No. At-1857. 19° Main Road Indian Abacus” ie a ot Achievers Abacus Mental Arithmetic Education for Brain Skills ASSESSMENT RESULT Marks Obtained Listening Mental Calculation : Question 1 ~ 5 : 2 Digit 11 rows. SECTION-A Question 6 ~ 10: 2 Digit 11 rows. Indian Abacus ~ Achievers Assessment stniach/17102013/01 SECTION-B 10 Marks each Abacus Time : 10 Mins 51469 | 396 a7 8 28| 6124] 942 92 741) -847 9] 7419 9 -5| 8324] 635] 3.61 | 9.27 | 5.16 5916 | 92160 83 | 90427] 9.76 | -4.03 | 9.04 32] 7462 | 36175 4] 192 | 761} 629 194] -37 8| 852] 7.47 | -1.59 | 1.50 7 4 g6| -91] 4.20 | 5.24] 8,72 925] -29] 751] 6830] 5.09 | 3.82 | 3.47 | 85310] 38627) 17539 83701 | 42951] 6042) 357] 2.15 | 8.26 | 7.03 | 40175 |-16379| 62972 8] 583 | 73194 | 48621] 8.93 | 6.90 | 4.95 | 62938 | 83194] 38156 463 6 5 6] 637 | -2.05 | 261 | 19482 |-47526 | 91480 38106 | 742] 462) 90542] 4.72 | 7.43 | 9.84 | 94260 | 61952] 59263 39| -68 | 96810] 8640] 1.94 | 5.16 | 3.17 | 37049 |-29415] 73841 4672 | 26473 94| -63| 2.79 |-3.92 | 5.08 | 51827 | 70283 | 60427 SECTION-C 5 Marks each Mental Time : 7 Mins 19 82 51 27 75 93 46 84 68 36 49 72 51 26 93 94 19 37 82 48 75 51 63 16 83 25 1 58 10 47 64 39 73 95 28 46 81 57 64 39 50 73 a1 46 74 28 Indian Abacus ~ Achievers Assessment QsiniAch/17102013/01 SECTION -D 5 Marks each Mental Time : 7 Mins 514] 935] 539] 624] 862 | 7.34 | 8.26 | 5.06 | 4.65 | 4.34 67 | -59 s2| -82| 46] 72 | -49 | 83 | -91 | 58 902} 364) 761| 416 | 694] 187 | 484] 851 | 3.70 | 8.17 7e| -82| 47] 60 | 27] 21 | -61 | 24 | -13 | 23 243] 516) 673| 947 | 319] 650 | 1.30] 271 | 7.90 | 9.36 95, 48 35 93 81 74 57 40 52 79 431 | 721) 418| 395 | 64] 919 | 382] 4.61 | 3.26 | 285 49 | 63 64] -26 | 260] 34 | -73 | 38 | -43 | 36 618 | -959 | 970 | -267 | 528 | 279 |-4.97 | 3.82 | 5.84 | 6.04 82 | 74 7e| 44 37 | 48 25 | 37 | -20 | 50 SECTION-E 5 ™Markseach Abacus / Mental Time: 4 Mins 9746 x 8 = 4802 +7 = 5069 x 2 = 8523 + 9= 6740x5= 1556 + 3023 x 3 = 1015 + 7236 x7 = 1131+ 3= 2574 x9 = 5064 +8 = 6712x6= 4512+ 6728 x4= 4320 + 8152xK7= 1424+4= 29 x 46 = 3268 + 43 = 46 x73 = 8918 + 98 = 82x 19= 1558 + 38 = 64x 96 = 2485 +71 = 17x35 = 8742 + 93 = 52x 67= 4416 + 69= Indian Abacus ~ Achievers Assessment QsinlAch/17102013/01 No. At-1857. 19° Main Road Indian Abacus” ie a ot Achievers Abacus Mental Arithmetic Education for Brain Skills ASSESSMENT RESULT Marks Obtained Listening Mental Calculation : Question 1 ~ 5 : 2 Digit 11 rows. SECTION-A Question 6 ~ 10: 2 Digit 11 rows. Indian Abacus ~ Achievers Assessment Qstn/ach/17102013/02 SECTION-B 10 Marks each Abacus Time : 10 Mins 69235 | 748 47 7 57| 4162] 954 16 246 | -403 5] 7273 8 3| 3235] 494] 253 | 7.28 | 1.67 1981 | 92153 47 | 38214] 8.76 | -242 | 264 22] 5310 | 66786 -1} 696 | 896 | 7.01 592 54 8| 714] 3.05 | -7.87 | 4.33 3 38 70| -59| 7.97 | 5.04] 9.51 406 21| 937) 4456] 7.24 |-3.31 | 3.45 | 17296 | 73259] 39058 65112 | 88004 | 1371] 691] 1.78 | 2.77 | 2.89 | 46420 |-13064 | 66158 7| 205 | 11016 | 20681] 9.59 | 2.26 | 7.89 | 67091 | 96578) 77409 528 4 6 -7} 8.34 | -5.94 | 7.89 | 19252 | 46087 | 38477 80140| 564] 475) 70831] 4.39 | 3.95 | 2.13 | 43198] 11910] 15309 36) -49 24| 8527] 7.24 | 9.33 | 2.72 | 64424 |-54874| 11659 8967 | 76724 | 89066 | 18] 5.64 | -3.21 | 4.14 | 14339 | 48096 | 24257 SECTION-C 5 Marks each Mental Time : 7 Mins 96 38 78 79 90 56 52 88 83 32 36 64 65 15 66 61 66 28 36 76 35 53 60 35 49 31 64 44 39 86 30 30 60 18 7 7 70 67 27 Indian Abacus ~ Achievers Assessment QsiniAch/17102013/02 SECTION -D 5 Marks each Mental Time : 7 Mins 260 | 595] 942] 487 | 298] 7.79 | 988 | 9.11 | 3.42 | 6.98 19] -12 34} -26| 45] 21 | -84 | 96 | -67 | 44 183 | 363 | 479] 893 | 839] 5.94 | 224 | 3.04 | 4.15 | 5.96 15 | -27 go} -98 | 33] 95 | -37 | 40 | -12 | 86 151 | 616 | 267] 209 | 538] 9.54 | 9.50 | 7.95 | 6.69 | 7.51 15| 79 ot} 31 18 | 85 43 | 60 | .72 | 52 272 | 561) 975| 924] 512] 167 | 1.35 | 4.03 | 9.49 | 7.29 78 | -42 go} -69 | 16] 29 | -91 | 90 | -37 | 74 156 | -146 | 770 | -483 | 774 | 7.98 |-692 | 662 | 5.55 | 5.92 76 | 60 so} 46 | 79] 25 17 | 29 | -85 | 88 SECTION-E 5 ™Markseach Abacus / Mental Time: 4 Mins 2498 x 6 = 3370+ 5 = 2994 x7 = 8505 + 9 = 6955 x2 = 4689 + 4661 x6 = 1700 + 5025 x 8 = 3872 +8 = 4732.x7 = 1350 +2= 7668 x4 = 1876 + 6175x5= 2208 + 6901 x7 = 4410+7= 62x 23 = 6555 + 95 = 75x41= 3952 + 76 = 81x73 = 1700 + 68 = 71x 43= 1110 +74 = 42x 10= 3990 + 87 = 77x34= 4770 + 53 = Indian Abacus ~ Achievers Assessment QsinlAch/17102013/02 No. At-1857. 19° Main Road Indian Abacus” ie a ot Achievers Abacus Mental Arithmetic Education for Brain Skills ASSESSMENT RESULT Marks Obtained Listening Mental Calculation : Question 1 ~ 5 : 2 Digit 11 rows. SECTION-A Question 6 ~ 10: 2 Digit 11 rows. Indian Abacus ~ Achievers Assessment stniach/17102013/03 SECTION-B 10 Marks each Abacus Time : 10 Mins 43484] 291 60 9 89] 1000] 149 76 543 | -691 3] 4596 7 8| 3875] 534] 6.09 | 7.86 | 3.60 6291 | 49636 70 | 27844] 4.51 |-3.70 | 230 13| 8117 | 43007 -9] 840 | 523] 379 668 48 3] 961] 9,79 | -1.61 | 1.77 6 a 89| -44] 168 | 5.33 | 8.97 455 20| 907) 1780] 3.85 |-5.09 | 7.15 | 14297 | 80171] 55334 77657 | 83058 5658) 618] 5.29 | 7.93 | 8.50 | 65300 |-67741| 87738 1| 502 | 81859 | 84232] 1.28 | 3.83 | 9.86 | 70807] 87816] 2120 693 9 7 -8} 8.22 |-1.06 | 5.71 | 76413 | 60388 | 30594 69075| 858] 412) 68483] 8.09 | 9.90 | 8.67 | 50515 | 91546 | 92669 56) -65 56| 3317] 6.07 | 4.28 | 8.03 | 69129 |-77226 | 13754 5539 | 77253 | 85327| -65| 4.69 | -5.87 | 1.48 | 95032 | 55901 | 71168 SECTION-C 5 Marks each Mental Time : 7 Mins 18 75 85 44 47 43 79 40 53 67 56 23 42 82 12 1 16 74 64 80 82 22 16 30 61 87 22 48 30 13 70 47 7 42 90 97 23 86 67 26 24 98 a 18 78 95 47 53 Indian Abacus ~ Achievers Assessment QsiniAch/17102013/03 SECTION-D 5 Marks each Mental Time : 7 Mins 984] 116] 895] 898] 280] 5.14 | 690 | 4.97 | 4.33 | 4.91 44.| -27 46 | -87 37 | 92 | -26| 88 | -76 | .99 999 | 385 | 923] 164 | 710] 701 | 540 | 369 | 4.02 | 242 69 | -59 16| -26 62 | 86 | -57 | .74 | -58 | .59 554 | 353 | 698) 397 | 510] 1.25 | 612 | 5.22 | 3.39 | 1.67 79] 87 72| 18 82] 92 51 | 78 | 44 55 920 | 839 | 944) 539 | 597] 277 | 4.76 | 4.09 | 1.36 | 7.93 51 | 54 65 | 50 34] 50 | -87 | .65 | -50 | .96 560 | 458 | 788] -414 | 595] 574 |-614 | 5.35 | 238 | 235 18 | 62 o7| 7 47 |_90 45 | 90 | —54 81 SECTION-E 5 Markseach = Abacus / Mental Time : 4 Mins 4890 x 8 = 1209+ 3= 5143 x2 = 5312 +8= 9364 x4 = 942+ 8136 x2= 2934 + 5252 x5 = 1206 + 6 = 3111 x3= 3332 +4= 8998 x2 = 800 +4= 6908 x 6 = 1500 + 8434 x9= 4205 + 5= 54x99 = 1394 + 41 = 11x39= 2592 + 36 = 82x 49= 1134 + 42 = 74x 92= 3976 + 56= 14x 82= 4590 + 85 = 59x 14= 1131 +39 = Indian Abacus ~ Achievers Assessment sinlAch/17102013/03 No. At-1857. 19° Main Road Indian Abacus” ie a ot Achievers Abacus Mental Arithmetic Education for Brain Skills ASSESSMENT RESULT Marks Obtained Listening Mental Calculation : Question 1 ~ 5 : 2 Digit 11 rows. SECTION-A Question 6 ~ 10: 2 Digit 11 rows. Indian Abacus ~ Achievers Assessment (stniach/17102013/04 SECTION-B 10 Marks each Abacus Time : 10 Mins 14459 | 643 59 9 97| 5879} 910 16 602 | -994 1] 4885 6 9| 1167] 292] 8.03 | 3.42 | 3.24 5999 | 47481 90 | 24867] 3.71 | -1.85 | 4.98 89| 4234 | 95812 7} 210 | 616} 2.04 741 96 4| 897] 2.61 |-1.00 | 6.55 5 a 64| -10] 7.73 | 9.28 | 2.00 403 72| 834] 4723] 9.46 |-2.61 | 294 | 37907] 91632] 89622 39332 | 72597] 3144) 943] 7.47 | 9.70 | 3.27 | 62115 |-34156| 76980 4| 423 | 37602 | 56984] 4.35 | 2.14 | 9.11 | 97926 | 48107] 92011 172 6 1 4] 625 |-4.20 | 1.73 | 66742 |-12128 | 33315 30518| 561] 114] 58022] 6.99 | 2.44 | 9.09 | 61830] 87490] 92085 66) -35 91] 2183] 6.90 | 4.82 | 3.89 | 50591 |-18461| 11070 6624 | 94009 | 81934 | -78| 4.77 | ~3.96 | 8.66 | 90498 | 72841 | 94930 SECTION-C 5 Marks each Mental Time : 7 Mins Indian Abacus ~ Achievers Assessment QsiniAch/17102013/04 SECTION -D 5 Marks each Mental Time : 7 Mins 612 | se1] 225] 323] 684] 835 | 942 | 223 | 692 | 6.54 71 | 95 es} -72| 59] 35 | -52| so | -29 | 44 179 | 704 | 269] 103 | 559] 874 | 616 | 7.25 | 453 | 6.02 69 | -11 75| -26| 20] 36 | —76 | so | —74 | 99 261 | 611) 434] 691 | 906] 988 | 859 | 9.26 | 3.01 | 1.46 62 | 383 66} 76 | 77] 24 sé | so | 98 | 58 220 | 272) 256| 388 | 646 | 154 | 5.17 | 9.12 | 236 | 242 71) 64 14| -76 | 90] 46 | -45 | 77 | =71 | 89 517 | 508) 944] -279 | 232 | 7.71 |-640 | 397 | 251 | 6.97 43 | 94 se} 56 | 77] 52 62 | 41 | -36 | 59 SECTION-E 5 ™Markseach Abacus / Mental Time: 4 Mins 7112x9= 1924+ 4= 6305 x 5 = 6951 +7= 3452 x 6 = 6174 + 8041 x7 = 5754+ 7445 x8 = 1778+7= 1620 x7 = 7560 + 9 = 9258.x 5 = 6576+ 8061 x4 = 2961 + 6862 x9 = 3204 +6 = 30 x 60 = 1740 + 87 = 71x 86 = 810 + 45 = 76 x 25 = 3672 + 68 = 70 x 80 = 3182 + 37 = 27x 59= 5476 + 74 = 28 x 96 = 1692 + 36 = Indian Abacus ~ Achievers Assessment QsinlAch/17102013/04

Оценить